Nike board of directors list
WebbGinger L. Graham. Lead Independent Director of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Former President and Chief Executive Officer, Amylin Pharmaceuticals. Learn more. Webb21 sep. 2024 · BEAVERTON, Ore., September 21, 2024 -- ( BUSINESS WIRE )--NIKE, Inc. (NYSE:NKE) today announced Mónica Gil and Bob Swan have been appointed to the Company’s Board of Directors. Gil is Chief...
Nike board of directors list
Did you know?
WebbNike Headquarters Address & Telefonnummer är en Bowerman Drive, Beaverton, OR 97005, USA. Nike huvudkontor ligger i Beaverton i delstaten Oregon i USA. ... Nike Board of Directors . PHILIP H. KNIGHT – Ordförande emeritus i NIKEs styrelse. MARK G. PARKER- Styrelseordförande i NIKE. Webb2 nov. 2024 · Nov 2, 2024. Nike board member John G. Connors will retire at the end of the year, according to a filing by the Beaverton-based sportswear maker. His decision …
Webb3 apr. 2024 · AMENDED AS OF APRIL 3, 2024. The Board of Directors (the “Board”) of Meta Platforms, Inc. (“Meta” or the “company”) has adopted these Corporate Governance Guidelines to reflect the Board’s strong commitment to sound corporate governance practices and to encourage effective policy and decision making at both the Board and … Webb12 juli 2024 · NIKE, Inc. (NYSE:NKE) today announced that NIKE Chairman Phil Knight has retired from the Board of Directors and the Board has appointed Mark Parker, Nike’s President and CEO since 2006, to the ...
Webb3 apr. 2014 · Yan Cordeau has a unique vision. An art and creative director by trade, Yan has developed a network of artists and creators from around the world that he collaborates with to create one of a kind projects. His eclectic street style and contemporary influences are definitive markers in his practice, owing to his keen eye and constant research. A … WebbMr. Boyce has served as a member of our board of directors since December 2016 and as our Lead Independent Director since July 2024. Mr. Boyce is a former partner at TPG Capital, one of the largest global investment partnerships, where he founded and led TPG’s Operating Group from 1997, in which capacity he served on several public company …
WebbOrg Chart Nike - The Official Board Board N-1 CEO & Director John Donahoe Move Chairman Emeritus Philip Knight Move Chairman of the Board Mark Parker Move …
WebbMark Parker (born October 21, 1955) is an American businessman. He serves as executive chairman of Nike, Inc. He was named the third CEO of the company in 2006 and served as president and CEO until 13 … comprehensions in juliaWebbMr. Terrell serves as a member of the board of directors of The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, and has served as a member of the board of the New York Life Insurance Company, Wellchoice Inc. (formerly Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield) and … comprehensions in hindiWebbNelsen began his career in 1989 as a practicing attorney with Best and Flanagan, LLP, a law firm located in Minneapolis, Minnesota. Mr. Nelsen is a member of the board of directors of NuShoe, Inc., a privately held shoe repair facility in San Diego, California. Richard M. Schulze is a founder of Best Buy and Chairman of our Board of Directors. comprehensions in pythonWebbnike corporate governancecharacter traits and feelings list 9 May, 2024 ... echo cs 352 air filterWebbAn independent director will be the chairman of the audit committee. The company secretary shall be the appointed secretary. 2. Nomination and Remuneration Committee. The committee shall comprise of at least three directors. All members must be non-executive directors. At least 50% of the directors shall be non-executive members. comprehensions ks1Webb12 juli 2024 · Cathleen Benko Joins NIKE, Inc. Board of Directors. 07/12/2024. BEAVERTON, Ore., July 12, 2024 --- NIKE, Inc. (NYSE: NKE) today announced that … comprehensions synonymWebb7 feb. 2024 · The estimated net worth of John G. Connors is at least $8.77 million as of March 26th, 2024. Mr. Connors owns 70,720 shares of NIKE stock worth more than $8,767,866 as of March 22nd. This net worth evaluation does not reflect any other assets that Mr. Connors may own. Learn More about John G. Connors' net worth. comprehensions ks2