WebAccenture (UK) Limited. General Management. Director. 27 October 2010 — 16 June 2024. RESIGNED. The Wimbledon Civic Theatre Trust Limited. Management Consultant. Director. 26 April 2010 — 17 July 2013. Web"The SJB group have executed in particularly aggressive timescales to secure a team hire that has helped us to rapidly achieve critical mass in a strategic growth area. The campaign was carried out expediently and with the attention to detail that we are accustomed to when working with the SJB group"
Jeremy Oates - Owner and Irrigation Design Engineer - LinkedIn
WebOur executive leadership team averages 24 years of experience with Accenture. Our leaders Julie Sweet Chair & CEO Muqsit Ashraf Lead – Strategy Jack Azagury Group Chief Executive – Strategy & Consulting Arjun Bedi Lead – Diamond Client Leadership Council Fabio Benasso Advisor to the Chair & CEO Andrea Brueckner Client Account Lead – Europe WebAug 10, 2009 · Q&A: Jeremy Oates - managing director for Accenture systems integration & technology. Dave Bailey. 10 August 2009 • 4 min read. schwab workspace login
Jeremy Joates (@JeremyJoates) Twitter
WebJeremy John Oates has been listed as a noteworthy management consultant by Marquis Who's Who. Membership Junior treasurer Cambridge University Conservative Association, 1985. Delegate National Union of Students, Cambridge, 1983-1984. Member Athenaeum. Connections Married Laura Chapman Jury, July 11, 1987. Children: James, Barnaby. Father: WebView Jeremy Oates results including current phone number, address, relatives, background check report, and property record with Whitepages. Menu Log In Sign Up WebNov 7, 2013 · Jon Hall chair of the Chartered Institute of IT opens the 9th CIO Event in style! DRIVING INNOVATION WHILE FOCUSING ON BUSINESS VALUE The Accenture Panel includes Jeremy Oates ACCENTURE Group Operations Officer - Technology Dr. Kevin O'Connor CARLSON WAGONLIT TRAVEL EVP, Chief Information Officer Paolo Cinelli IKEA … schwab yardley pa